+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, August 14, 2013.
- Chapter 782, 2013 Laws.
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 7, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by McKeown. Passed.Ayes, 60.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Johnson.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness, then Ways and Means.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #765
Adopted
Amendment #644
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Veterans And Emergency Preparedness
Type:
Primary Sponsor