+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules by order of the President.
- Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/30/2019 2:57 PM)