+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #5497
4/13/2015 3:03:31 PM
Amendment #5133
4/6/2015 11:48:54 AM
Amendment #5132
4/6/2015 11:48:54 AM