+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2022.
- Chapter 412, 2021 Laws.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; Nays, 3--Heard, Linthicum, Robinson.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Bonham. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Smith G.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 2--Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 3--Boquist, Frederick, Heard.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session cancelled.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session cancelled.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/5/2021 12:06 PM)
Amendment -A2
Proposed (10/12/2021 3:31 PM)
Amendment -A3
Adopted (5/19/2021 9:13 AM)