+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 27, 2015.
- Chapter 797, 2015 Laws.
On July 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 2, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed.Ayes, 60.
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue, then Ways and Means.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor