+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 11, 2019.
- Chapter 346, 2019 Laws.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 60.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/2/2019 3:38 PM)