+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 359, 2019 Laws.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 2--Hernandez, Speaker Kotek.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Revenue.
- Referred to Revenue by order of Speaker.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--President Courtney, Thomsen.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/25/2019 9:54 AM)