+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session cancelled.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment -3
Proposed (4/6/2021 8:44 AM)
Amendment -5
Combined (4/9/2021 11:29 PM)
Amendment -6
Combined (4/9/2021 11:29 PM)
Amendment -7
Adopted (4/14/2021 11:50 AM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (4/5/2021 12:46 PM)