+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 1, 2013.
- Chapter 606, 2013 Laws.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 24; nays, 5--Baertschiger, Ferrioli, George, Kruse, Whitsett; excused, 1--Burdick.
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Richardson.
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Starr. Thomsen, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (12)
Amendment #2855
Adopted
Amendment #2841
Adopted
Amendment #2742
Not Adopted
Amendment #2749
Not Adopted
Amendment #2653
Not Adopted
Amendment #2741
Not Adopted
Amendment #2606
Not Adopted
Amendment #1958
Adopted
Amendment #1835
Not Adopted
Amendment #1621
Not Adopted
Amendment #1224
Not Adopted
Amendment #1025
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Business And Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor