+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 23, 2019.
- Chapter 629, 2019 Laws.
On July 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 10, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse, Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 18--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Gelser, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.
- Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr, Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boles, Hansell, Heard, Knopp, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum.
On June 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care, then Ways and Means.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A9
Adopted (6/18/2019 1:08 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/4/2019 1:05 PM)