+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2018.
- Chapter 346, 2017 Laws.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Smith DB.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar.
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 30.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 03-13 by unanimous consent.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.