+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2022.
- Chapter 656, 2021 Laws.
On July 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Thatcher.
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 17; Nays, 12--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 16--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 2--Bonham, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Morgan.
- Motion to rerefer to Rules failed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 37--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Clem, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Valderrama, Wilde, Williams, Witt; Excused, 2--Bonham, Smith G.
- Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 36--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Clem, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Valderrama, Williams, Witt; Excused, 2--Bonham, Smith G.
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 11--Anderson, Beyer, Findley, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Gelser, Girod, Thomsen.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Labor and Business.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -3
Adopted (6/15/2021 8:19 PM)
Amendment -6
Proposed (6/16/2021 2:07 PM)
Amendment -7
Proposed (6/17/2021 1:20 PM)
Amendment -MR8
Proposed (6/18/2021 12:37 PM)