+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, May 7, 2019.
- Chapter 94, 2019 Laws.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 52; Absent, 1--McLain; Excused, 5--Barker, Evans, Holvey, Nearman, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Power, Speaker Kotek.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Winters; Excused, 1--President Courtney.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 03-05 by unanimous consent.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.