+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment #5976
4/17/2015 9:34:40 AM
Amendment #5975
4/17/2015 9:34:40 AM
Amendment #5974
4/17/2015 9:34:40 AM
Amendment #5423
4/13/2015 9:53:44 AM
Amendment #5422
4/13/2015 9:53:43 AM
Amendment #4978
4/1/2015 10:36:16 AM