+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session cancelled.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services, then Ways and Means.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -3
Adopted (4/1/2019 10:54 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/25/2019 2:27 PM)