+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective Date, September 29, 2019.
- Chapter 423, 2019 Laws.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Hansell.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Boles, Clem.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2019 Calendar.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Thomsen; Excused, 2--Riley, Winters.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Human Services be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary, then Human Services.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A4
Adopted (5/21/2019 8:45 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/3/2019 3:43 PM)