+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 26, 2013.
- Chapter 534, 2013 Laws.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 21, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 30.
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Clem, Gilliam. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Bailey.
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2013 Calendar.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2013 Calendar.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading. Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 1--Girod; excused, 3--Johnson, Shields, Winters.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care and Human Services.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.