+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 12--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Monnes Anderson, Olsen, Thomsen.
- Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 18--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Fagan, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Hass, Johnson, Manning Jr, Monnes Anderson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-04 by unanimous consent.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed B-Eng. Minority)
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) Baertschiger Jr, Boquist not concurring.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment -B12
Proposed (6/17/2019 7:39 AM)
Amendment -AMR11
Proposed (5/22/2019 5:08 PM)
Amendment -A9
Adopted (5/20/2019 8:19 AM)
Amendment -7
Adopted (4/4/2019 2:08 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/20/2019 2:03 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (3/22/2019 10:43 AM)