+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 6, 2015.
- Chapter 675, 2015 Laws.
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from 06-22 Calendar and placed on 06-25 Calendar on voice vote.
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Esquivel. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Buckley, Williamson.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 16, 2015 Calendar.
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 15, 2015 Calendar.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2015 Calendar.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2015 Calendar.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2015 Calendar.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #6876
5/22/2015 3:48:58 PM
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor