+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter 672, 2021 Laws.
- Effective date, September 1, 2021.
On August 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Dexter, Smith G, Wilde; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bonham.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Manning Jr.
- Second reading.
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session not held.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -5
Adopted (4/7/2021 11:42 AM)
Amendment -A7
Adopted (6/20/2021 3:09 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/18/2021 5:36 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/1/2021 2:30 PM)