+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 18, 2015.
- Chapter 499, 2015 Laws.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Boquist.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed.Ayes, 45; Nays, 5--Heard, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Weidner; Excused, 4--Buehler, Gorsek, Hack, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Bentz, Buckley, Davis, McKeown, Vega Pederson, Speaker Kotek.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 4, 2015 Calendar.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2015 Calendar.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2015 Calendar.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Burdick, Shields.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-29 by unanimous consent.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment #
5/15/2015 1:57:12 PM
Amendment #6653
5/15/2015 1:57:12 PM
Amendment #6953
5/15/2015 1:57:12 PM
Amendment #6164
4/20/2015 10:17:06 AM
Amendment #5784
4/15/2015 4:43:03 PM
Amendment #5939
4/15/2015 4:43:03 PM
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor