+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Public Safety by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Public Safety.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor