+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2018.
- Chapter 128, 2017 Laws.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 3--Gorsek, Johnson, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Rayfield, Smith Warner, Williamson.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass and be placed on Consent Calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 02-14 by unanimous consent.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.