+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.