+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's veto message entered into Journal.
- Governor vetoed.
On July 10, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 6, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McKeown.
On July 5, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to July 6, 2017 Calendar.
On July 1, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to July 5, 2017 Calendar.
On June 30, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 28, 2018 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 30.
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Second reading.
On June 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On April 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to lay on the table carried. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Girod; Excused, 2--Boquist, Kruse.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/13/2017 3:35:27 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (3/30/2017 3:51:40 PM)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor