+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2016.
- Chapter 300, 2015 Laws.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed.Ayes, 44; Nays, 12--Bentz, Davis, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, McLane, Nearman, Post, Sprenger, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 4--Barton, Gallegos, Heard, Piluso.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 29, 2015 Calendar.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2015 Calendar.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2015 Calendar.
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2015 Calendar.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Whitsett, Winters.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Workforce.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor