+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 24, 2013.
- Chapter 488, 2013 Laws.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley.
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2013 Calendar.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2013 Calendar.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 4, 2013 Calendar.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2013 Calendar.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2013 Calendar.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Johnson, Whitsett.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1995
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor