+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 508, 2019 Laws.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 19; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Boquist.
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 23--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Evans, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Witt, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Marsh.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2019 Calendar.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A2
Adopted (6/3/2019 12:27 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (5/6/2019 8:21 AM)