+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 27, 2019.
- Chapter 516, 2019 Laws.
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Leif. Passed. Ayes, 60.
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to June 18, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 29.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (5/30/2019 6:23 PM)