+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to rerefer to Health Care carried by voice vote.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from 03-26 Calendar and placed on 03-31 Calendar on voice vote.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment #
3/25/2015 12:15:56 PM
Amendment #4792
3/25/2015 12:15:56 PM
Amendment #4440
3/9/2015 10:06:53 AM
Amendment #4299
3/9/2015 10:06:53 AM