+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (3)
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment #1167
4/8/2013 4:01:38 PM
Amendment #1432
4/10/2013 6:25:18 PM
Amendment #2485
5/23/2013 9:06:46 AM
Amendment #2486
5/23/2013 9:06:46 AM
Amendment #1166
4/8/2013 4:01:38 PM