+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, February 28, 2019.
- Chapter 1, 2019 Laws.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Evans.
- Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 25--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Gomberg, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Witt, Zika.
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Helt.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Fagan, Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher, Winters; Excused, 2--Olsen, Thomsen.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Housing.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (10)
Amendment -11
Proposed (2/20/2019 9:39 AM)
Amendment -9
Proposed (2/18/2019 6:23 PM)
Amendment -8
Proposed (2/18/2019 6:23 PM)
Amendment -10
Proposed (2/19/2019 11:04 AM)
Amendment -7
Proposed (2/18/2019 6:23 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (2/1/2019 12:01 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/1/2019 12:01 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/1/2019 12:01 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/1/2019 12:01 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/1/2019 12:01 PM)