+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2022.
- Chapter 681, 2021 Laws.
On August 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 31; Nays, 24--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Clem, Drazan, Evans, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Meek, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Witt, Wright; Excused, 3--Dexter, Smith G, Wilde; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Zika.
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2021 Calendar.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard, Thatcher.
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 13--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Cancelled.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment -9
Adopted (4/7/2021 5:51 PM)
Amendment -A17
Proposed (6/15/2021 4:17 PM)
Amendment -A19
Proposed (6/15/2021 4:18 PM)
Amendment -A21
Adopted (6/17/2021 8:00 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/12/2021 4:27 PM)