+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 337, 2019 Laws.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Post, Sollman; Excused, 3--Barreto, Boshart Davis, McKeown.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Fagan, Gelser, Johnson.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -3
Adopted (3/29/2019 3:07 PM)