+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2022.
- Chapter 400, 2021 Laws.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Wilde. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 6--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Moore-Green, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 1--Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bynum.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Returned to Full Committee.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 2--Boquist, Heard.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (3/24/2021 9:22 AM)