+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 13, 2013.
- Chapter 415, 2013 Laws.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--McLane, Speaker Kotek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Thatcher.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2013 Calendar.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2013 Calendar.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 29, 2013 Calendar.
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2013 Calendar.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor