+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date, September 20, 2020.
- Chapter 9, 2020 Laws.
On September 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor signed with line-item veto.
On August 20, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On August 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Fagan, Girod, Hass, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Hansell, Olsen.
- Referred to The Second Special Session of 2020.
- Work Session held.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
On August 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to The Second Special Session of 2020.
On August 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation filed by Golden.
On August 10, 2020 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 22--Barker, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Clem, Evans, Hayden, Helt, Hernandez, Keny-Guyer, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Neron, Owens, Post, Prusak, Reschke, Stark, Wallan, Williams, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 3--Barreto, Mitchell, Power.
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Keny-Guyer, Williams.
On August 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.