+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2014.
- Chapter 344, 2013 Laws.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Bailey. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Cameron, Freeman, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Gelser.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2013 Calendar.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 29, 2013 Calendar.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2013 Calendar.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2013 Calendar.
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2013 Calendar.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Bates, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Johnson, Whitsett.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #1956
Adopted
Amendment #1796
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Business And Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor