+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Workforce by order of the President.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services and Early Childhood.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment #5191
4/7/2015 9:38:20 AM
Amendment #5190
4/7/2015 9:38:20 AM
Amendment #5022
4/2/2015 11:07:06 AM
Amendment #5175
4/2/2015 11:07:06 AM
Amendment #4954
3/31/2015 1:17:46 PM
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor