+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 19, 2017.
- Chapter 607, 2017 Laws.
On July 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Lininger. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 6--Barreto, Esquivel, Hayden, Parrish, Power, Whisnant.
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On July 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Boquist; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Amendments distributed.)
On July 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (7/1/2017 6:43:35 PM)