+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 1, 2013.
- Chapter 557, 2013 Laws.
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Jenson. Passed.Ayes, 34; Nays, 25--Barton, Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Unger.
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 9--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from 06-19 Calendar and placed on 06-20 Calendar on voice vote.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Second reading.
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor