+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 20, 2019.
- Chapter 480, 2019 Laws.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 15--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Findley, Leif, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Barker, Marsh.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Taylor.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (5/23/2019 12:53 PM)