+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 1, 2013.
- Chapter 450, 2013 Laws.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Dembrow; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Buckley, Read.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2013 Calendar.
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2013 Calendar.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2013 Calendar.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Whitsett. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Boquist, Knopp, Olsen.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor