+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 6, 2017.
- Chapter 566, 2017 Laws.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by McLane, Smith G.
- Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Boone, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Bentz, McKeown, Speaker Kotek.
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 26, 2017 Calendar.
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Linthicum, Thatcher; excused, 1--Boquist.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -3
Adopted (6/8/2017 12:15:32 PM)
Amendment -2
Recommended (5/31/2017 9:09:20 AM)
Amendment -1
Recommended (5/22/2017 4:58:08 PM)