+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 25, 2013.
- Chapter 675, 2013 Laws.
On July 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 15, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 6, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 38; Nays, 21--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Hanna, Hicks, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Weidner.
- Second reading.
On July 5, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Bates,Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 23; nays, 7--Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Kruse, Whitsett.
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor