+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 1, 2017.
- Chapter 373, 2017 Laws.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Noble.
- Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 5--McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Sprenger; Excused, 2--Boone, Piluso.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar.
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Linthicum, Thatcher; excused, 1--Gelser.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (5/3/2017 4:42:04 PM)