+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 1, 2015.
- Chapter 409, 2015 Laws.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Post, Weidner; Excused, 1--Rayfield.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2015 Calendar.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2015 Calendar.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2015 Calendar.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Boquist, Thatcher; excused, 1--Prozanski.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #6621
5/14/2015 1:18:47 PM
Amendment #6534
5/8/2015 3:20:23 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor