+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 53; Nays, 6--Barreto, Hack, Kennemer, McLane, Nearman, Weidner; Excused, 1--Boone.
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Thomsen.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session cancelled.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #
6/4/2015 11:54:19 AM
Amendment #7366
6/4/2015 11:54:19 AM
Amendment #7153
6/1/2015 12:32:10 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor