+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, August 6, 2021.
- Chapter 673, 2021 Laws.
On August 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Pham. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 20--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 4--Dexter, Hayden, Smith G, Wilde.
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2021 Calendar.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 8--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (6/17/2021 7:24 PM)