+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter 535, 2017 Laws.
- Effective date, July 1, 2017.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by McKeown, Meek, Smith DB, Sollman.
- Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 18--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Doherty, Fahey, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Keny-Guyer, Malstrom, Marsh, McKeown, Meek, Reschke, Sanchez, Smith DB, Sollman, Williamson, Witt; Absent, 1--Piluso; Excused, 5--Bentz, Boone, Hernandez, Nearman, Whisnant; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 19, 2017 Calendar.
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Linthicum.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (5/25/2017 11:32:34 AM)